OK SB2033 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 05/28/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 05/28/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Schools; relating to teacher incentive pay plans; modifying requirements. Effective dates. Emergency.
Title
Schools; relating to teacher incentive pay plans; modifying requirements. Effective dates. Emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Benge [R] | Sen. Glenn Coffee [R] | Sen. John Ford [R] | Sen. Clark Jolley [R] |
Sen. Debbe Leftwich [D] | Sen. Andrew Rice [D] | Sen. Jabar Shumate [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-05-26 - House - House: (Y: 75 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-05-25 - House - House: CCR (Y: 36 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2010-04-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 61 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-05-25 - House - House: CCR (Y: 36 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2010-04-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 61 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Approved by Governor 05/28/2010 | |
2010-05-27 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-05-27 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2010-05-27 | Enrolled, to House | |
2010-05-26 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-05-26 | To Senate | |
2010-05-26 | Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 75 Nays: 25; Ayes: 73 Nays: 23 | |
2010-05-26 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Shumate | |
2010-05-26 | CCR adopted | |
2010-05-25 | Ayes: 36 Nays: 60 | |
2010-05-25 | CCR failed of adoption | |
2010-05-25 | CCR submitted | |
2010-05-25 | Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 37 Nays: 10 | |
2010-05-25 | coauthored by Rice, Leftwich | |
2010-05-25 | CCR adopted | |
2010-05-21 | coauthored by Ford | |
2010-05-21 | Enacting clause restored | |
2010-05-21 | Title restored | |
2010-05-21 | CCR read | |
2010-05-21 | SCs changed Laster to Rice, Leftwich | |
2010-05-10 | Pending coauthorship Senator(s) Ford | |
2010-05-05 | SCs named Coffee, Ford, Jolley, Lamb, Laster | |
2010-04-29 | Conference granted, HC's named Benge, Coody, Denney, Sears, Buck, Morrissette | |
2010-04-28 | HAs rejected, conference requested | |
2010-04-26 | HAs read | |
2010-04-26 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-04-22 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-04-22 | Motion expired | |
2010-04-21 | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Sears | |
2010-04-21 | Emergency failed: Ayes: 50 Nays: 41 | |
2010-04-21 | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Sears | |
2010-04-21 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 61 Nays: 37 | |
2010-04-21 | General Order | |
2010-04-08 | Enacting clause stricken | |
2010-04-08 | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2010-03-16 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2010-03-10 | First Reading | |
2010-03-10 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-03-09 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-09 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 12 | |
2010-03-09 | coauthored by Jolley | |
2010-03-09 | General Order, Considered | |
2010-02-22 | coauthored by Benge (principal House author) | |
2010-02-22 | Title stricken | |
2010-02-22 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2010-02-18 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; pending CR | |
2010-02-12 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Benge | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Senator Coffee | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 11 | 103 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 1210 | 544 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 5 | 141 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 6 | 101 | New Code | See Bill Text |