OK SB203 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB203

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-21 - Coauthored by Representative Roberts (Dustin) (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Motor vehicles; modifying authority to stop and weigh vehicles. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor vehicles; modifying authority to stop and weigh vehicles. Effective date.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-21SenateCoauthored by Representative Roberts (Dustin) (principal House author)
2017-02-14SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Transportation committee; CR filed
2017-02-07SenateSecond Reading referred to Transportation
2017-02-06SenateAuthored by Senator Allen
2017-02-06SenateFirst Reading

Same As/Similar To

SB203 (Carry Over) 2017-02-21 - Coauthored by Representative Roberts (Dustin) (principal House author)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4714111New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback