OK SB203 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB203
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-21 - Coauthored by Representative Roberts (Dustin) (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-21 - Coauthored by Representative Roberts (Dustin) (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicles; modifying authority to stop and weigh vehicles. Effective date.
Title
Motor vehicles; modifying authority to stop and weigh vehicles. Effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-21 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Roberts (Dustin) (principal House author) |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Transportation committee; CR filed |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Transportation |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Allen |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB203 (Carry Over) 2017-02-21 - Coauthored by Representative Roberts (Dustin) (principal House author)