OK SB202 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB202
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-20 - Title stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-20 - Title stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Group homes; requiring certain reimbursement method; directing certain conversion of facilities under certain condition. Effective date.
Title
Group homes; requiring certain reimbursement method; directing certain conversion of facilities under certain condition. Effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-20 | Senate | Title stricken |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Title stricken |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Remove as author Senator Thompson; authored by Senator Smalley |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Thompson |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB202 (Carry Over) 2019-02-20 - Title stricken