OK SB201 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by Governor 05/13/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Vulnerable adults; modifying and adding certain definitions to the Protective Services for Vulnerable Adults Act. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vulnerable adults; modifying and adding certain definitions to the Protective Services for Vulnerable Adults Act. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 33) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Human Services Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13SenateApproved by Governor 05/13/2019
2019-05-07SenateSent to Governor
2019-05-07HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2019-05-07SenateEnrolled, to House
2019-05-06SenateReferred for enrollment
2019-05-06SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0
2019-05-06SenateHAs adopted
2019-04-29SenateHAs read
2019-04-29HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-04-25HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-04-25HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 68 Nays: 0
2019-04-25HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Lawson, Manger, Roe
2019-04-25HouseGeneral Order
2019-04-11HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
2019-03-28HouseRecommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Human Services Subcommittee
2019-03-20HouseReferred to Appropriations and Budget Human Services Subcommittee
2019-03-19HouseSecond Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
2019-03-13HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-13SenateEngrossed to House
2019-03-12SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-03-12SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
2019-03-12SenateTitle restored
2019-03-12SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2019-03-11SenateCoauthored by Senator Bergstrom
2019-03-05SenateCoauthored by Representative McEntire (principal House author)
2019-02-20SenateTitle stricken
2019-02-20SenateReported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
2019-02-18SenateReferred to Appropriations
2019-02-18SenateReported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
2019-02-05SenateSecond Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2019-02-04SenateAuthored by Senator Thompson
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb201&Session=1900
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20INT/SB/SB201%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/SFLR/SB201%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENGR/SB/SB201%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCSS/SB201%20HCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/HFLR/SB201%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/SB201%20HASB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENR/SB/SB201%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/SB201_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/SB201_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback