OK SB2008 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-28 - Title restored
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Rural Economic Action Plan; requiring development of plan to measure qualitative effects of certain projects. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Rural Economic Action Plan; requiring development of plan to measure qualitative effects of certain projects. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-04-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - House - House: Rural Development Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 36 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Agriculture & Rural Affairs: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-28SenateTitle restored
2024-05-28SenateCCR read
2024-05-16HouseConference granted, naming Conference Committee on Rural Development
2024-04-30SenateSCs named Rader, Kidd, Hall, Hamilton, Jech, Paxton, Young
2024-04-30SenateHAs rejected, conference requested
2024-04-16SenateHAs read
2024-04-16HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2024-04-15HouseReferred for engrossment
2024-04-15HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 2
2024-04-15HouseGeneral Order
2024-04-04HouseTitle stricken
2024-04-04HouseCR; Do Pass, as amended, Rural Development Committee
2024-03-25HouseSecond Reading referred to Rural Development
2024-03-13HouseFirst Reading
2024-03-13SenateEngrossed to House
2024-03-12SenateReferred for engrossment
2024-03-12SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 7
2024-03-12SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2024-02-26SenateReported Do Pass Agriculture and Rural Affairs committee; CR filed
2024-02-06SenateSecond Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Affairs
2024-02-05SenateCoauthored by Representative Hasenbeck (principal House author)
2024-02-05SenateAuthored by Senator Rader
2024-02-05SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb2008&Session=2400
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20INT/SB/SB2008%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20FLR/SFLR/SB2008%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20ENGR/SB/SB2008%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20FLR/HFLR/SB2008%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/SB2008%20HASB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/Senate/SB2008%20INT%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/SB2008%20ENGR%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/Senate/SB2008%20CCR%20BILLSUM.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/SB2008_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/SB2008_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback