OK SB2001 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Approved by Governor 04/22/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Approved by Governor 04/22/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Alcoholic beverages; allowing licensed employees to sample alcoholic beverages under certain circumstances; specifying amounts. Emergency.
Title
Alcoholic beverages; allowing licensed employees to sample alcoholic beverages under certain circumstances; specifying amounts. Emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Coleman [R] | Rep. Neil Hays [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-16 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 69 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - House - House: Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Business & Commerce: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - House - House: Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Business & Commerce: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/22/2024 |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2024-04-17 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2024-04-16 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2024-04-16 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 69 Nays: 20 |
2024-04-16 | House | General Order |
2024-04-11 | House | CR; Do Pass Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee |
2024-04-02 | House | Referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances |
2024-04-02 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2024-03-25 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2024-03-13 | House | First Reading |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 3 |
2024-03-12 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Hays (principal House author) |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Coleman |
2024-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |