OK SB200 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB200
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Approved by Governor 05/04/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Approved by Governor 05/04/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Landlord and tenant; authorizing early termination of tenancy under certain circumstances; prohibiting certain provisions in rental agreement. Effective date.
Title
Landlord and tenant; authorizing early termination of tenancy under certain circumstances; prohibiting certain provisions in rental agreement. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. John Montgomery [R] | Rep. Daniel Pae [R] | Rep. Monroe Nichols [D] | Rep. Andy Fugate [D] |
Rep. Trish Ranson [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 40 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 78 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - House: Judiciary - Civil Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Judiciary: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 78 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - House: Judiciary - Civil Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Judiciary: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-04 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/04/2021 |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-29 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 6 |
2021-04-28 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2021-04-13 | Senate | HAs read |
2021-04-13 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2021-04-12 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2021-04-12 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 11 |
2021-04-12 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Ranson |
2021-04-12 | House | General Order |
2021-03-31 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Fugate |
2021-03-31 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2021-03-22 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil |
2021-03-02 | House | First Reading |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 1 |
2021-03-01 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2021-02-09 | Senate | coauthored by Nichols |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Pae (principal House author) |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Montgomery |
2021-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB200 (Carry Over) 2021-05-04 - Approved by Governor 05/04/2021