OK SB200 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB200
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Approved by Governor 05/07/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Approved by Governor 05/07/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Compete with Canada Act; increasing certain limits; authorizing payments from Quick Action Closing Fund under certain circumstances. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Compete with Canada Act; increasing certain limits; authorizing payments from Quick Action Closing Fund under certain circumstances. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Roger Thompson [R] | Rep. Jason Dunnington [D] | Rep. Scott Fetgatter [R] | Rep. Garry Mize [R] |
Sen. Kay Floyd [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 37 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/07/2019 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-05-02 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 8 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2019-04-29 | Senate | HAs read |
2019-04-29 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-04-25 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-04-25 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 5 |
2019-04-25 | House | Amended |
2019-04-25 | House | House Rule suspended |
2019-04-25 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Fetgatter, Mize |
2019-04-25 | House | General Order |
2019-03-28 | House | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2019-03-25 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee |
2019-03-20 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2019-03-13 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Floyd |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Emergency passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 7 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 8 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Emergency clause restored |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Title restored |
2019-03-12 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Dunnington (principal House author) |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Title stricken |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Title stricken |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Finance committee; CR filed |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Thompson |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB200 (Carry Over) 2019-05-07 - Approved by Governor 05/07/2019