OK SB20 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB20

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-02-20 - Coauthored by Senator Pittman
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Teachers; requiring teacher training to include training on appropriate behavior with students. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Teachers; requiring teacher training to include training on appropriate behavior with students. Effective date.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-20SenateCoauthored by Senator Pittman
2017-02-13SenateReferred to Appropriations
2017-02-13SenateEmergency clause stricken
2017-02-13SenateTitle stricken
2017-02-13SenateReported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed
2017-02-07SenateSecond Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2017-02-06SenateAuthored by Senator Loveless
2017-02-06SenateFirst Reading

Same As/Similar To

SB20 (Carry Over) 2017-02-20 - Coauthored by Senator Pittman

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
706194New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback