OK SB2 | 2017 | 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 25 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-09-26 - Referred to Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Motor vehicles; repealing various sections of the Motor Carrier Act. Effective date. Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor vehicles; repealing various sections of the Motor Carrier Act. Effective date. Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 65 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 79 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 70 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 31 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-26SenateReferred to Rules
2017-09-26SenateWithdrawn from Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget committee
2017-09-26SenateSecond Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget
2017-09-25SenateAuthored by Senator Allen
2017-09-25SenateFirst Reading

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
471621Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
471665Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
471691Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
471693Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
471694Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
471695Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
471696Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
471697Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
471701Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
471702Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
471711Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
471712Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
471721Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
471772Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
471773Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
4723024Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
4723026Repealed CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback