OK SB1971 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 25 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-25 - Sent to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Status: Enrolled on May 25 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-25 - Sent to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Attorney General; Tobacco Settlement Fund apportionment. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Attorney General; Tobacco Settlement Fund apportionment. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 84 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-05-25 - House - House: ADOPT JCR (Y: 60 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 31) [PASS]
2012-05-25 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 26 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [FAIL]
2012-05-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-05-22 - House - House: Joint Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-25 - House - House: ADOPT JCR (Y: 60 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 31) [PASS]
2012-05-25 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 26 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [FAIL]
2012-05-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-05-22 - House - House: Joint Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-25 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-05-25 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2012-05-25 | Enrolled, to House | |
2012-05-25 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-05-25 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2012-05-25 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 6 | |
2012-05-25 | Ayes: 60 Nays: 7 | |
2012-05-25 | JCR adopted | |
2012-05-25 | Laid over | |
2012-05-25 | General Order | |
2012-05-24 | Second Reading, direct to Joint Calendar | |
2012-05-23 | First Reading | |
2012-05-23 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-05-23 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 | |
2012-05-23 | JCR adopted | |
2012-05-22 | Emergency added | |
2012-05-22 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget committee; JCR filed | |
2012-05-09 | Second Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget | |
2012-05-08 | coauthored by Martin (Scott) | |
2012-05-08 | coauthored by Sears (principal House author) | |
2012-05-08 | coauthored by Justice | |
2012-05-08 | Authored by Senator Jolley | |
2012-05-08 | First Reading |