OK SB1948 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Approved by Governor 05/21/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Approved by Governor 05/21/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Multiple versions of statutes; amending, merging, consolidating and repealing multiple versions of statutes. Emergency.
Title
Multiple versions of statutes; amending, merging, consolidating and repealing multiple versions of statutes. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2020-05-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-05-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/21/2020 |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2020-05-15 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2020-05-15 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2020-05-15 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 1 |
2020-05-15 | House | General Order |
2020-05-13 | House | Second Reading, direct to Calendar |
2020-05-12 | House | First Reading |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2020-05-12 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Direct to Calendar |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Kannady (principal House author) |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Authored by Senator Daniels |
2020-05-07 | Senate | First Reading |