OK SB193 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Approved by Governor 05/28/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Schools; accreditation standards; modifying circumstances under which penalties cannot be assessed. Effective date. Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Schools; accreditation standards; modifying circumstances under which penalties cannot be assessed. Effective date. Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-22 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE AND ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-28SenateApproved by Governor 05/28/2019
2019-05-22SenateSent to Governor
2019-05-22HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2019-05-22SenateEnrolled, to House
2019-05-22SenateCoauthored by Senator Sharp
2019-05-22SenateReferred for enrollment
2019-05-22HouseTo Senate
2019-05-22HouseFourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 0
2019-05-22HouseCCR adopted
2019-05-22HouseCCR submitted
2019-05-22SenateMeasure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 45 Nays: 1
2019-05-22SenateCCR adopted
2019-05-17SenateCCR read
2019-05-14HouseConference granted, naming GCCA
2019-05-08SenateSCs named Pemberton, Stanislawski, Haste, Quinn, Dossett, Ikley-Freeman
2019-05-06SenateHAs rejected, conference requested
2019-04-29SenateHAs read
2019-04-29HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-04-25HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-04-25HouseThird Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 0
2019-04-25HouseGeneral Order
2019-04-11HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Hasenbeck
2019-04-11HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
2019-03-27HouseRecommendation to the full committee; Do Pass as amended Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee
2019-03-25HouseReferred to Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee
2019-03-25HouseReferred to Appropriations and Budget
2019-03-25HouseWithdrawn from Common Education Committee
2019-03-19HouseSecond Reading referred to Common Education
2019-02-19HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-19SenateEngrossed to House
2019-02-18SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-02-18SenateMeasure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 1
2019-02-18SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2019-02-13SenateCoauthored by Representative McBride (principal House author)
2019-02-12SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Education committee; CR filed
2019-02-05SenateSecond Reading referred to Education
2019-02-04SenateAuthored by Senator Pemberton
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb193&Session=1900
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20INT/SB/SB193%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCS/SB193%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/SFLR/SB193%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENGR/SB/SB193%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCSS/SB193%20HCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/HFLR/SB193%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/SB193%20HASB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCCS/SB193%20CCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENR/SB/SB193%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/SB193_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/SB193_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback