OK SB1928 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 06/08/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 06/08/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Crimes and punishments; modifying provisions related to escapes by juveniles and youthful offenders. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Crimes and punishments; modifying provisions related to escapes by juveniles and youthful offenders. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-25 - House - House: (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-03-22 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-03-22 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Approved by Governor 06/08/2010 | |
2010-05-27 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-05-27 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2010-05-27 | Enrolled, to House | |
2010-05-26 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-05-25 | To Senate | |
2010-05-25 | Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0 | |
2010-05-25 | CCR adopted | |
2010-05-24 | CCR submitted | |
2010-05-24 | Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 39 Nays: 2 | |
2010-05-24 | CCR adopted | |
2010-05-17 | CCR read | |
2010-05-06 | Conference granted, HC's named Jordan, Duncan, McCullough, Cooksey, Inman, Lamons | |
2010-05-06 | SCs named Newberry, Anderson, Sykes, Nichols, Paddack, Jolley | |
2010-05-05 | HAs rejected, conference requested | |
2010-05-05 | Considered and deferred | |
2010-04-26 | HAs read | |
2010-04-26 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-04-22 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-04-22 | Motion expired | |
2010-04-21 | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Jordan | |
2010-04-21 | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 4; Ayes: 54 Nays: 31 | |
2010-04-21 | General Order | |
2010-03-23 | Title restored | |
2010-03-23 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee | |
2010-03-16 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2010-03-09 | First Reading | |
2010-03-09 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-03-08 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-08 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 7 | |
2010-03-08 | Title stricken | |
2010-03-08 | General Order, Amended | |
2010-02-18 | coauthored by Jordan (principal House author) | |
2010-02-18 | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed | |
2010-02-17 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Jordan | |
2010-02-16 | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; pending CR | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Senator Newberry | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
21 | 443 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
21 | 444 | New Code | See Bill Text |