OK SB1923 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Approved by Governor 06/03/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Approved by Governor 06/03/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Service Warranty Act; adding definitions; references; applicability under the Vehicle Protection Product Act. Effective date.
Title
Service Warranty Act; adding definitions; references; applicability under the Vehicle Protection Product Act. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Newberry [R] | Rep. Justin Wood [R] | Rep. Jon Echols [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-05-21 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 33 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - House - House: Insurance Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - House - House: Insurance Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-03 | Senate | Approved by Governor 06/03/2014 |
2014-05-23 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2014-05-23 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2014-05-23 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2014-05-23 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2014-05-23 | House | To Senate |
2014-05-23 | House | Measure passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 0 |
2014-05-23 | House | CCR adopted |
2014-05-21 | House | CCR submitted |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 33 Nays: 12 |
2014-05-21 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2014-05-20 | Senate | CCR read |
2014-05-14 | House | Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Insurance |
2014-05-05 | Senate | SCs named Newberry, Brown, Sharp, Ford, Shumate, Ellis |
2014-05-05 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2014-04-16 | Senate | HAs read |
2014-04-16 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-04-15 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-04-15 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 3 |
2014-04-15 | House | General Order |
2014-03-31 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Echols |
2014-03-31 | House | Remove Representative Echols as principal House author and substitute with Representative Wood |
2014-03-31 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Insurance Committee |
2014-03-13 | House | Second Reading referred to Insurance |
2014-03-05 | House | First Reading |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Insurance committee; CR filed |
2014-02-17 | Senate | coauthored by Echols (principal House author) |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Insurance |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Newberry |
2014-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 141 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 141 | 18 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 141 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 141 | 24 | New Code | See Bill Text |