OK SB1918 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-17 - Reported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Controlled dangerous substances; providing certain liability protections related to opioid prescribing and dispensing. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Controlled dangerous substances; providing certain liability protections related to opioid prescribing and dispensing. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health And Human Services: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-17SenateReported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
2020-02-13Senatecoauthored by Rosecrants
2020-02-10SenateSecond Reading referred to Health and Human Services
2020-02-06SenateCoauthored by Representative Echols (principal House author)
2020-02-03SenateAuthored by Senator Standridge
2020-02-03SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback