OK SB1916 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in GCCA
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in GCCA
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Public health and safety; directing the State Department of Health to establish and maintain a registry for home care agency workers. Effective date.
Title
Public health and safety; directing the State Department of Health to establish and maintain a registry for home care agency workers. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. John Ford [R] | Rep. Ron Peters [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2010-04-06 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-06 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Died in GCCA | |
2010-05-04 | Conference granted, HC's named Peters, Liebmann, Billy, Rousselot, Shumate | |
2010-04-29 | SCs named GCCA | |
2010-04-28 | HAs rejected, conference requested | |
2010-04-19 | HAs read | |
2010-04-19 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-04-15 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-04-15 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 7 | |
2010-04-15 | General Order | |
2010-04-07 | Title restored | |
2010-04-07 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee | |
2010-03-29 | Referred to Public Health Committee | |
2010-03-29 | Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2010-03-16 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2010-02-24 | First Reading | |
2010-02-24 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-02-23 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-02-23 | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 | |
2010-02-23 | General Order, Considered | |
2010-02-15 | coauthored by Peters (principal House author) | |
2010-02-15 | Title stricken | |
2010-02-15 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2010-02-15 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Peters | |
2010-02-11 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; pending CR | |
2010-02-03 | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass as amended Appr/Sub-Health and Human Services sub-committee | |
2010-02-01 | Referred to Appr/Sub-Health and Human Services | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Senator Ford | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |