OK SB1914 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Approved by Governor 06/03/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]

Summary

Arrest of juveniles; prohibiting consideration of certain juvenile matters for certain purposes. Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Arrest of juveniles; prohibiting consideration of certain juvenile matters for certain purposes. Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-04-16 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 78 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - House - House: Judiciary Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - House - House: Judiciary Committee Meeting: DIVISION (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-06-03SenateApproved by Governor 06/03/2014
2014-05-22SenateSent to Governor
2014-05-22HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2014-05-22SenateEnrolled, to House
2014-05-21SenateReferred for enrollment
2014-05-21HouseTo Senate
2014-05-21HouseMeasure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0
2014-05-21HouseCCR adopted
2014-05-21HouseCCR submitted
2014-05-21SenateMeasure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 37 Nays: 0
2014-05-21SenateCCR adopted
2014-05-19SenateCCR read
2014-05-12HouseConference granted, naming Conference Committee on Judiciary
2014-05-05SenateSCs named Griffin, Sykes, Johnson (Rob), Sharp, McAffrey, Garrison
2014-04-28SenateHAs rejected, conference requested
2014-04-21SenateHAs read
2014-04-17HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2014-04-16HouseReferred for engrossment
2014-04-16HouseThird Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 10
2014-04-16HouseGeneral Order
2014-04-09HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee
2014-03-19HouseSecond Reading referred to Judiciary
2014-03-13HouseFirst Reading
2014-03-13SenateEngrossed to House
2014-03-12SenateReferred for engrossment
2014-03-12SenateMeasure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0
2014-03-12SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2014-02-11SenateReported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed
2014-02-06Senatecoauthored by Nelson (principal House author)
2014-02-04SenateSecond Reading referred to Judiciary
2014-02-03SenateAuthored by Senator Griffin
2014-02-03SenateFirst Reading

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10A22New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback