OK SB1910 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-11 - Remove as principal author Representative McBride and substitute with Representative McCall
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-11 - Remove as principal author Representative McBride and substitute with Representative McCall
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Students with disabilities; directing school district boards of education to adopt certain policy regarding the transfer of students with disabilities. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Students with disabilities; directing school district boards of education to adopt certain policy regarding the transfer of students with disabilities. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Education: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-11 | Senate | Remove as principal author Representative McBride and substitute with Representative McCall |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative McBride (principal House author) |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Treat |
2024-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |