OK SB1903 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-06 - Withdrawn from Judiciary, Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-06 - Withdrawn from Judiciary, Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Domestic violence; providing certain protocol questions for lethality assessment. Effective date.
Title
Domestic violence; providing certain protocol questions for lethality assessment. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Kay Floyd [D] | Rep. Carol Bush [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | House | Withdrawn from Judiciary, Direct to Calendar |
2020-03-17 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2020-03-05 | House | First Reading |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 1 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Bush (principal House author) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Floyd |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |