OK SB1903 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Vetoed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Vetoed 06/10/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Status: Vetoed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Vetoed 06/10/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Insurance; creating the Oklahoma Home Service Contract Act. Effective date.
Title
Insurance; creating the Oklahoma Home Service Contract Act. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-27 - House - House: (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2010-04-19 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2010-04-19 - House - House: AM (Y: 51 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2010-03-31 - House - House: Economic Development and Financial Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-19 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2010-04-19 - House - House: AM (Y: 51 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2010-03-31 - House - House: Economic Development and Financial Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Vetoed 06/10/2010 | |
2010-05-28 | Veto message read | |
2010-05-28 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-06-01 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2010-05-28 | Enrolled, to House | |
2010-05-28 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-05-27 | To Senate | |
2010-05-27 | Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 0 | |
2010-05-27 | 2 CCR adopted | |
2010-05-26 | 2 CCR submitted | |
2010-05-26 | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0 | |
2010-05-26 | 2 CCR adopted | |
2010-05-25 | 2 CCR read | |
2010-05-21 | Further conference granted, same conferees | |
2010-05-21 | CCR rejected, further conference requested, same conferees | |
2010-05-21 | Enacting clause restored | |
2010-05-21 | Title restored | |
2010-05-21 | CCR read | |
2010-05-13 | Conference granted, HC's named Sullivan, McDaniel (Randy), Moore, Auffet, Carey | |
2010-04-29 | SCs named Aldridge, Brown, Mazzei, Stanislawski, Ballenger | |
2010-04-27 | HAs rejected, conference requested | |
2010-04-20 | HAs read | |
2010-04-20 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-04-19 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-04-19 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 5 | |
2010-04-19 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Sherrer | |
2010-04-19 | General Order | |
2010-03-31 | Enacting clause stricken | |
2010-03-31 | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Economic Development and Financial Services Committee | |
2010-03-16 | Second Reading referred to Economic Development and Financial Services | |
2010-02-24 | First Reading | |
2010-02-24 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-02-23 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-02-23 | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 2 | |
2010-02-23 | coauthored by Brown | |
2010-02-23 | General Order, Considered | |
2010-02-16 | coauthored by Sullivan (principal House author) | |
2010-02-16 | Title stricken | |
2010-02-16 | Reported Do Pass as amended Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed | |
2010-02-16 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Sullivan | |
2010-02-11 | Reported Do Pass as amended Retirement and Insurance committee; pending CR | |
2010-02-08 | Pending coauthorship Senator(s) Brown | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Senator Aldridge | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
36 | 6670 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 6671 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 6672 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 6673 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 6674 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 6675 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |