OK SB1901 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 06/08/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 06/08/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Native American Cultural and Educational Authority; extending scope of power regarding commercial facilities. Effective date.
Title
Native American Cultural and Educational Authority; extending scope of power regarding commercial facilities. Effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Lisa Billy [R] | Sen. Bill Brown [R] | Sen. Harry Coates [R] | Rep. Larry Glenn [D] |
Rep. Chuck Hoskin [D] | Sen. Shane Jett [R] | Rep. Dan Kirby [R] | Rep. Ken Luttrell [R] |
Sen. Al McAffrey [D] | Rep. Randy McDaniel [R] | Rep. Skye McNiel [R] | Rep. Jerry McPeak [D] |
Rep. Jason Nelson [R] | Sen. Anastasia Pittman [D] | Sen. Andrew Rice [D] | Rep. Seneca Scott [D] |
Rep. Jerry Shoemake [D] | Rep. Todd Thomsen [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-05-27 - House - House: (Y: 93 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2010-04-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2010-03-29 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Natural Resources &: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2010-03-29 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Natural Resources &: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Approved by Governor 06/08/2010 | |
2010-05-28 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-05-28 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2010-05-28 | Enrolled, to House | |
2010-05-28 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-05-27 | To Senate | |
2010-05-27 | Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 3 | |
2010-05-27 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hoskin | |
2010-05-27 | CCR adopted | |
2010-05-21 | CCR submitted | |
2010-05-21 | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 40 Nays: 5 | |
2010-05-21 | CCR adopted, GCCA | |
2010-05-13 | Enacting clause restored | |
2010-05-13 | Title restored | |
2010-05-13 | CCR read, GCCA | |
2010-05-04 | Conference granted, HC's named McDaniel (Randy), Miller, Martin (Scott), Hickman, Brannon, Pittman | |
2010-04-28 | SCs named GCCA | |
2010-04-27 | HAs rejected, conference requested | |
2010-04-26 | HAs read | |
2010-04-26 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-04-22 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-04-22 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 5 | |
2010-04-22 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Thomsen, Brown, Shoemake, Scott | |
2010-04-22 | General Order | |
2010-04-08 | Enacting clause stricken | |
2010-04-08 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Kirby, Luttrell, Glenn, McPeak, McNiel, McAffrey, Billy | |
2010-04-08 | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2010-03-16 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2010-03-03 | First Reading | |
2010-03-03 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-03-02 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-02 | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 2 | |
2010-03-02 | coauthored by Jett | |
2010-03-02 | General Order, Considered | |
2010-02-22 | coauthored by Pittman, Nelson | |
2010-02-22 | coauthored by McDaniel (Randy) (principal House author) | |
2010-02-22 | Title stricken | |
2010-02-22 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2010-02-18 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; pending CR | |
2010-02-10 | Pending coauthorship Representative(s) Pittman, Nelson | |
2010-02-10 | Pending authorship Representative(s) McDaniel (Randy) | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations | |
2010-02-01 | coauthored by Rice | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Senator Coates | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |