OK SB1895 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 06/09/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 06/09/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Probate procedure; modifying applicability of provisions relating to probate and estate tax; providing that certain lien is not necessary under certain circumstances; providing for construction and application of language. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Probate procedure; modifying applicability of provisions relating to probate and estate tax; providing that certain lien is not necessary under certain circumstances; providing for construction and application of language. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-28 - House - House: (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-04-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2010-04-05 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2010-04-05 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Approved by Governor 06/09/2010 | |
2010-05-28 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-05-28 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2010-05-28 | Enrolled, to House | |
2010-05-28 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-05-28 | To Senate | |
2010-05-28 | Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 99 Nays: 0 | |
2010-05-28 | Coauthored by Representative(s) McCullough | |
2010-05-28 | CCR adopted | |
2010-05-26 | CCR submitted | |
2010-05-26 | Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 | |
2010-05-26 | CCR adopted | |
2010-05-21 | Title restored | |
2010-05-21 | CCR read | |
2010-05-10 | Conference granted, HC's named Sherrer, McCullough, Nelson, Derby, Lamons, Carey, Hickman | |
2010-05-06 | SCs named Anderson, Crain, Mazzei, Coffee, Sykes, Jolley, Ivester, Laster | |
2010-05-06 | HAs rejected, conference requested | |
2010-04-19 | HAs read | |
2010-04-19 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-04-15 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-04-15 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0 | |
2010-04-15 | Amended by floor substitute | |
2010-04-15 | General Order | |
2010-04-06 | Title restored | |
2010-04-06 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee | |
2010-03-16 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2010-02-23 | First Reading | |
2010-02-23 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-02-22 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-02-22 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 | |
2010-02-22 | General Order, Considered | |
2010-02-15 | coauthored by Sherrer (principal House author) | |
2010-02-15 | Title stricken | |
2010-02-15 | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed | |
2010-02-12 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Sherrer | |
2010-02-02 | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; pending CR | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Senator Anderson | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
58 | 1104 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
58 | 282 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
58 | 635 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
58 | 912 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
68 | 804 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
84 | 187 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |