OK SB1890 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-06 - Second Reading, direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-06 - Second Reading, direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Public finance; creating the Oklahoma Prosperity Act; establishing powers and duties of State Treasurer; requiring participating employers to offer employees opportunity to contribute to certain account created under Program. Effective date.
Title
Public finance; creating the Oklahoma Prosperity Act; establishing powers and duties of State Treasurer; requiring participating employers to offer employees opportunity to contribute to certain account created under Program. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-06 | House | Second Reading, direct to Calendar |
2020-03-11 | House | First Reading |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 5 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Title restored |
2020-03-10 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2020-03-04 | Senate | coauthored by Mize |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Coleman |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Leewright |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Title stricken |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative McEntire (principal House author) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Montgomery |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |