OK SB1889 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-23 - CCR submitted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-23 - CCR submitted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Law Enforcement; campus police investigations. Effective date.
Title
Law Enforcement; campus police investigations. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Josh Brecheen [R] | Rep. Doug Cox [R] | Rep. David Derby [R] | Rep. Michael Jackson [R] |
Sen. Bryce Marlatt [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-23 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-05-22 - House - House: Conference Committee on Public Safety,: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-16 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-04-04 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-05-22 - House - House: Conference Committee on Public Safety,: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-16 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-04-04 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-23 | CCR submitted | |
2012-05-23 | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0 | |
2012-05-23 | coauthored by Marlatt | |
2012-05-23 | CCR adopted | |
2012-05-22 | Remove as author Senator Marlatt; authored by Senator Brecheen | |
2012-05-22 | CCR read | |
2012-05-15 | Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Public Safety, Judiciary and Military Affairs | |
2012-05-15 | SCs named Marlatt, Barrington, Treat, Adelson, Coates, Burrage | |
2012-05-09 | HAs rejected, conference requested | |
2012-04-17 | HAs read | |
2012-04-17 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-04-16 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-04-16 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0 | |
2012-04-16 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Cox | |
2012-04-16 | General Order | |
2012-04-04 | Title restored | |
2012-04-04 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Derby | |
2012-04-04 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee | |
2012-03-19 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | |
2012-03-14 | First Reading | |
2012-03-14 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-03-13 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-13 | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 | |
2012-03-13 | General Order, Considered | |
2012-02-28 | coauthored by Jackson (principal House author) | |
2012-02-28 | Title stricken | |
2012-02-28 | Reported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed | |
2012-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Senator Marlatt | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |