OK SB1874 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-06 - Withdrawn from Health Services and Long-Term Care, Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-06 - Withdrawn from Health Services and Long-Term Care, Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Emergency response systems; adding definitions. Effective date.
Title
Emergency response systems; adding definitions. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health And Human Services: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health And Human Services: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | House | Withdrawn from Health Services and Long-Term Care, Direct to Calendar |
2020-03-17 | House | Second Reading referred to Health Services and Long-Term Care |
2020-03-09 | House | First Reading |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 1 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Hill (principal House author) |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Rosino |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |