OK SB1872 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 06/06/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 06/06/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Professions and occupations; providing for voluntary review of plans and Electrical License Act. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Professions and occupations; providing for voluntary review of plans and Electrical License Act. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-25 - House - House: (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2010-03-31 - House - House: Economic Development and Financial Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2010-03-31 - House - House: Economic Development and Financial Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Approved by Governor 06/06/2010 | |
2010-05-27 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-05-27 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2010-05-27 | Enrolled, to House | |
2010-05-26 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-05-25 | To Senate | |
2010-05-25 | Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 0 | |
2010-05-25 | CCR adopted | |
2010-05-24 | CCR submitted | |
2010-05-24 | Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0 | |
2010-05-24 | CCR adopted | |
2010-05-20 | Enacting clause restored | |
2010-05-20 | Title restored | |
2010-05-20 | CCR read | |
2010-05-05 | Conference granted, HC's named Jordan, Sullivan, McDaniel (Randy), Watson, Sherrer, Shumate | |
2010-05-04 | SCs named Coates, Newberry, Brogdon, Russell, Adelson | |
2010-05-03 | HAs rejected, conference requested | |
2010-04-26 | HAs read | |
2010-04-26 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-04-22 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-04-22 | Motion expired | |
2010-04-21 | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Jordan | |
2010-04-21 | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 2; Ayes: 55 Nays: 31 | |
2010-04-21 | Amended | |
2010-04-21 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Moore | |
2010-04-21 | General Order | |
2010-03-31 | Enacting clause stricken | |
2010-03-31 | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Economic Development and Financial Services Committee | |
2010-03-16 | Second Reading referred to Economic Development and Financial Services | |
2010-03-03 | First Reading | |
2010-03-03 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-03-02 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-02 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 | |
2010-03-02 | Title stricken | |
2010-03-02 | General Order, Amended | |
2010-02-17 | coauthored by Jordan (principal House author) | |
2010-02-17 | Reported Do Pass Business and Labor committee; CR filed | |
2010-02-15 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Jordan | |
2010-02-09 | Reported Do Pass Business and Labor committee; pending CR | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Business and Labor | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Senator Coates | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
59 | 1681 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 1682 | New Code | See Bill Text |