OK SB1871 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 06/06/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]

Summary

Engineering and surveying; modifying powers of the Board; modifying procedures. Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Engineering and surveying; modifying powers of the Board; modifying procedures. Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-04-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2010-03-31 - House - House: Economic Development and Financial Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-05-28 Approved by Governor 06/06/2010
2010-05-26 Sent to Governor
2010-05-26 Signed, returned to Senate
2010-05-26 Enrolled, to House
2010-05-25 Referred for enrollment
2010-05-24 To Senate
2010-05-24 Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 3
2010-05-24 CCR adopted
2010-05-20 CCR submitted
2010-05-20 Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
2010-05-20 CCR adopted
2010-05-17 Enacting clause restored
2010-05-17 Title restored
2010-05-17 CCR read
2010-05-04 Conference granted, HC's named Steele, Sullivan, McDaniel (Randy), Carey, Hoskin
2010-05-04 SCs named Coates, Anderson, Sykes, Crain, Barrington, Burrage
2010-05-03 HAs rejected, conference requested
2010-04-26 HAs read
2010-04-26 Engrossed, signed, to Senate
2010-04-22 Referred for engrossment
2010-04-22 Motion expired
2010-04-20 Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Steele
2010-04-20 Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 1; Ayes: 54 Nays: 33
2010-04-20 General Order
2010-03-31 Enacting clause stricken
2010-03-31 Coauthored by Representative(s) Harrison
2010-03-31 CR; Do Pass, as amended, Economic Development and Financial Services Committee
2010-03-16 Second Reading referred to Economic Development and Financial Services
2010-03-03 First Reading
2010-03-03 Engrossed to House
2010-03-02 Referred for engrossment
2010-03-02 Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0
2010-03-02 coauthored by Jones
2010-03-02 General Order, Considered
2010-03-01 Pending coauthorship Representative(s) Jones
2010-02-18 coauthored by Steele (principal House author)
2010-02-18 coauthored by Burrage, Barrington
2010-02-18 Title stricken
2010-02-18 Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Labor committee; CR filed
2010-02-16 Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Labor committee; pending CR
2010-02-10 Pending coauthorship Senator(s) Barrington
2010-02-10 Pending authorship Representative(s) Steele
2010-02-09 Referred to Business and Labor
2010-02-09 Withdrawn from Judiciary committee
2010-02-08 Pending coauthorship Senator(s) Burrage
2010-02-02 Second Reading referred to Judiciary
2010-02-01 Authored by Senator Coates
2010-02-01 First Reading

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
594002Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5947522New CodeSee Bill Text
594758New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback