OK SB1855 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - Approved by Governor 04/25/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - Approved by Governor 04/25/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Alternative Fuels Technician Certification Act; modifying equipment and facilities under Department authority. Effective date.
Title
Alternative Fuels Technician Certification Act; modifying equipment and facilities under Department authority. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Simpson [R] | Rep. Brad Boles [R] | Sen. Kim David [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - House - House: Energy and Natural Resources Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Energy: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - House - House: Energy and Natural Resources Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Energy: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/25/2022 |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2022-04-21 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2022-04-20 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2022-04-20 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 0 |
2022-04-20 | House | General Order |
2022-04-07 | House | CR; Do Pass Energy and Natural Resources Committee |
2022-03-29 | House | Second Reading referred to Energy and Natural Resources |
2022-03-10 | House | First Reading |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Energy committee; CR filed |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Boles (principal House author) |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Energy |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator David |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Remove as author Senator David; authored by Senator Simpson |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Authored by Senator David |
2022-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |