OK SB1854 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-26 - Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-26 - Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Immunizations; requiring certain information be provided to schools. Effective date.
Title
Immunizations; requiring certain information be provided to schools. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Nathan Dahm [R] | Rep. Kevin West [R] | Sen. Joe Newhouse [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Education: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Education: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-26 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative West (Kevin) (principal House author) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Title stricken |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Newhouse |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Dahm |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |