OK SB1839 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-05 - Coauthored by Senator(s) Rogers
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-05 - Coauthored by Senator(s) Rogers
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Security guards and private investigators; authorizing security guards to carry long guns and handguns during the performance of their duties. Effective date.
Title
Security guards and private investigators; authorizing security guards to carry long guns and handguns during the performance of their duties. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-05 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business, Commerce And Tourism: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business, Commerce And Tourism: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-05 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Rogers |
2022-04-05 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee |
2022-03-28 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2022-03-15 | House | First Reading |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 8 |
2022-03-14 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Hilbert (principal House author) |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Authored by Senator Leewright |
2022-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |