OK SB1836 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-28 - Coauthored by Representative Bell (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-28 - Coauthored by Representative Bell (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicles; creating diabetes awareness special license plate; creating revolving fund. Effective date.
Title
Motor vehicles; creating diabetes awareness special license plate; creating revolving fund. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Transportation: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-28 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Bell (principal House author) |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Title stricken |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Transportation committee; CR filed |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Transportation |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Authored by Senator Hicks |
2022-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |