OK SB1835 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-02 - HAs read
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-02 - HAs read
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Oklahoma Water Resources Board; requiring certain report; establishing penalties for noncompliance. Effective date.
Title
Oklahoma Water Resources Board; requiring certain report; establishing penalties for noncompliance. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-27 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - House - House: Energy and Natural Resources Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Energy: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - House - House: Energy and Natural Resources Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Energy: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-02 | Senate | HAs read |
2022-05-02 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2022-04-27 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2022-04-27 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 0 |
2022-04-27 | House | General Order |
2022-04-07 | House | Title restored |
2022-04-07 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Pederson |
2022-04-07 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Energy and Natural Resources Committee |
2022-03-30 | House | Second Reading referred to Energy and Natural Resources |
2022-03-24 | House | First Reading |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative West (Josh) (principal House author) |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Title stricken |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Energy committee; CR filed |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Energy |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Authored by Senator Bergstrom |
2022-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |