OK SB1830 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Approved by Governor 04/18/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Approved by Governor 04/18/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Admissibility of evidence; modifying requirements for admissibility of certain evidence. Effective date.
Title
Admissibility of evidence; modifying requirements for admissibility of certain evidence. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 64 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-04-02 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-04-02 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | Approved by Governor 04/18/2012 | |
2012-04-12 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-04-12 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2012-04-12 | Enrolled, to House | |
2012-04-11 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-04-11 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2012-04-11 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 64 Nays: 26 | |
2012-04-11 | General Order | |
2012-04-03 | CR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee | |
2012-03-19 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2012-03-14 | First Reading | |
2012-03-14 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-03-13 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-13 | Measure passed: Ayes: 32 Nays: 8 | |
2012-03-13 | General Order, Considered | |
2012-02-28 | coauthored by Schwartz (principal House author) | |
2012-02-28 | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed | |
2012-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Senator Jolley | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |