OK SB1823 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-18 - Approved by Governor 05/18/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Midwifery; creating Shepherd's Law; providing for licensure of midwives; creating the Advisory Committee on Midwifery. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Midwifery; creating Shepherd's Law; providing for licensure of midwives; creating the Advisory Committee on Midwifery. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health And Human Services: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-18SenateApproved by Governor 05/18/2020
2020-05-12SenateSent to Governor
2020-05-12HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2020-05-12SenateEnrolled, to House
2020-05-11SenateReferred for enrollment
2020-05-11HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2020-05-11HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 12
2020-05-11HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Fugate, Luttrell, Stark
2020-05-11HouseGeneral Order
2020-04-06HouseWithdrawn from Rules, Direct to Calendar
2020-03-17HouseSecond Reading referred to Rules
2020-03-05HouseFirst Reading
2020-03-05SenateEngrossed to House
2020-03-04SenateReferred for engrossment
2020-03-04SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 5
2020-03-04SenateTitle restored
2020-03-04SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2020-03-04SenateCoauthored by Senator Hicks
2020-02-19SenateTitle stricken
2020-02-19SenateReported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
2020-02-18SenateCoauthored by Representative Roe (principal House author)
2020-02-17SenateReferred to Appropriations
2020-02-17SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
2020-02-10SenateSecond Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2020-02-03SenateAuthored by Senator Stanley
2020-02-03SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback