OK SB1820 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-06 - Withdrawn from Rules, Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-06 - Withdrawn from Rules, Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Legal representation; modifying requirements for contracting for certain legal representation. Effective date.
Title
Legal representation; modifying requirements for contracting for certain legal representation. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Committee On General Government: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Committee On General Government: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | House | Withdrawn from Rules, Direct to Calendar |
2020-03-17 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2020-03-10 | House | First Reading |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 9 |
2020-03-09 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute General Government committee; CR filed |
2020-02-26 | Senate | remove as principal author Representative Echols and substitute with Representative ODonnell |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Echols (principal House author) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Montgomery |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator David |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |