OK SB182 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-13 - Measure failed: Ayes: 22 Nays: 20
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-13 - Measure failed: Ayes: 22 Nays: 20
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Summary
Motor vehicles; graduated driver license; hand-held electronic device. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Motor vehicles; graduated driver license; hand-held electronic device. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-13 | Measure failed: Ayes: 22 Nays: 20 | |
2012-03-13 | General Order, Considered | |
2012-02-21 | coauthored by Morgan (principal House author) | |
2012-02-21 | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Senator Crain | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |