OK SB1816 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-06 - Second Reading, direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-06 - Second Reading, direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Income tax compliance; repealing provision relating to nonrenewal of license for noncompliant taxpayer. Effective date.
Title
Income tax compliance; repealing provision relating to nonrenewal of license for noncompliant taxpayer. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Scott [R] | Rep. Cynthia Roe [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 36 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Committee On General Government: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Committee On General Government: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-06 | House | Second Reading, direct to Calendar |
2020-03-12 | House | First Reading |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 10 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Title stricken |
2020-03-11 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Roe (principal House author) |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Referred to General Government |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Withdrawn from Finance committee |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Scott |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |