OK SB1816 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-08 - Approved by Governor 06/08/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]

Summary

Schools; creating the Statewide Virtual Charter School Board; powers and duties of the board. Effective date. Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Schools; creating the Statewide Virtual Charter School Board; powers and duties of the board. Effective date. Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-05-25 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 84 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-05-24 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 40 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-05-23 - House - House: General Conference Committee: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-26 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 50 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2012-04-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 51 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2012-04-10 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-02 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Education: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-06-08 Approved by Governor 06/08/2012
2012-05-25 Sent to Governor
2012-05-25 Signed, returned to Senate
2012-05-25 Enrolled, to House
2012-05-25 Referred for enrollment
2012-05-25 To Senate
2012-05-25 Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 10; Ayes: 83 Nays: 6
2012-05-25 Coauthored by Representative(s) Murphey
2012-05-25 CCR adopted
2012-05-24 CCR submitted
2012-05-24 Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 40 Nays: 3
2012-05-24 Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 3
2012-05-24 CCR adopted, GCCA
2012-05-23 Emergency added
2012-05-23 Title restored
2012-05-23 CCR read, GCCA
2012-05-23 SCs named Stanislawski, Jolley, Halligan, Justice, Burrage, Ballenger
2012-05-23 Withdrawn from GCCA - referred to conference
2012-05-07 Conference granted, naming GCCA
2012-05-02 SCs named GCCA
2012-05-01 HAs rejected, conference requested
2012-04-30 HAs read
2012-04-30 Engrossed, signed, to Senate
2012-04-26 Referred for engrossment
2012-04-26 Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 51 Nays: 31; Ayes: 50 Nays: 28
2012-04-26 Title stricken
2012-04-26 Amended
2012-04-26 General Order
2012-04-12 Coauthored by Representative(s) Kern
2012-04-12 Remove Representative Kern as principal House author and substitute with Representative Quinn
2012-04-12 CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
2012-03-19 Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
2012-03-14 First Reading
2012-03-14 Engrossed to House
2012-03-13 Referred for engrossment
2012-03-13 Emergency passed: Ayes: 32 Nays: 11
2012-03-13 Measure passed: Ayes: 31 Nays: 12
2012-03-13 Title restored
2012-03-13 General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
2012-03-01 Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
2012-02-21 Referred to Appropriations
2012-02-21 coauthored by Kern (principal House author)
2012-02-21 Title stricken
2012-02-21 Reported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed
2012-02-08 Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2012-02-06 Authored by Senator Stanislawski
2012-02-06 First Reading

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
701210508New CodeSee Bill Text
701210523Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
701210526New CodeSee Bill Text
701210732Amended CodeSee Bill Text
701455Amended CodeSee Bill Text
703132New CodeSee Bill Text
703140New CodeSee Bill Text
703145Amended CodeSee Bill Text
708103New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback