OK SB1814 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - Approved by Governor 04/25/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - Approved by Governor 04/25/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Soldiers and sailors; Oklahoma Veterans Centers; specifying establishment of sites; transfer of operations. Emergency.
Title
Soldiers and sailors; Oklahoma Veterans Centers; specifying establishment of sites; transfer of operations. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 77 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - House - House: Veterans and Military Affairs Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Veterans And Military Affairs: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - House - House: Veterans and Military Affairs Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Veterans And Military Affairs: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/25/2022 |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2022-04-21 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2022-04-20 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2022-04-20 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 11 |
2022-04-20 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Roberts (Sean) |
2022-04-20 | House | General Order |
2022-04-06 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Gann |
2022-04-06 | House | CR; Do Pass Veterans and Military Affairs Committee |
2022-03-28 | House | Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs |
2022-03-10 | House | First Reading |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 5 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Veterans and Military Affairs committee; CR filed |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Hardin (Tommy) (principal House author) |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Authored by Senator Stanley |
2022-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |