OK SB1801 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-06 - Withdrawn from Judiciary, Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-06 - Withdrawn from Judiciary, Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Oklahoma Open Meeting Act; adding Judicial Nominating Commission to definition of public body; authorizing executive session for certain purposes. Emergency.
Title
Oklahoma Open Meeting Act; adding Judicial Nominating Commission to definition of public body; authorizing executive session for certain purposes. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Judiciary: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Judiciary: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | House | Withdrawn from Judiciary, Direct to Calendar |
2020-03-17 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2020-03-10 | House | First Reading |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 9 |
2020-03-09 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Bullard |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Kannady (principal House author) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Daniels |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |