OK SB1800 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-08 - Approved by Governor 05/08/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]

Summary

Child care facilities; creating a child care facility review board for non-emergency license revocations, suspensions or denials. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child care facilities; creating a child care facility review board for non-emergency license revocations, suspensions or denials. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-04-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 80 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-04-02 - House - House: Human Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-08 Approved by Governor 05/08/2012
2012-05-03 Sent to Governor
2012-05-03 Signed, returned to Senate
2012-05-03 Enrolled, to House
2012-05-02 Referred for enrollment
2012-05-02 Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0
2012-05-02 HAs adopted
2012-04-11 HAs read
2012-04-11 Engrossed, signed, to Senate
2012-04-10 Referred for engrossment
2012-04-10 Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 9
2012-04-10 General Order
2012-04-03 Title restored
2012-04-03 CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Human Services Committee
2012-03-19 Second Reading referred to Human Services
2012-03-13 First Reading
2012-03-13 Engrossed to House
2012-03-12 Referred for engrossment
2012-03-12 Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
2012-03-12 General Order, Considered
2012-02-22 coauthored by Walker (principal House author)
2012-02-22 Title stricken
2012-02-22 Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
2012-02-09 Referred to Appr/Sub-Health and Human Services
2012-02-08 Second Reading referred to Appropriations
2012-02-06 Authored by Senator David
2012-02-06 First Reading

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
104042Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback