OK SB18 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by Governor 04/30/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Sales tax; modifying time period for during which exemption may be claimed for rolling stock. Effective date. Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sales tax; modifying time period for during which exemption may be claimed for rolling stock. Effective date. Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-24 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30SenateApproved by Governor 04/30/2019
2019-04-25SenateSent to Governor
2019-04-25HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2019-04-25SenateEnrolled, to House
2019-04-24SenateReferred for enrollment
2019-04-24HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2019-04-24HouseThird Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 4
2019-04-24HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Stone
2019-04-24HouseGeneral Order
2019-03-28HouseCR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee
2019-03-19HouseSecond Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
2019-03-07HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-07SenateEngrossed to House
2019-03-06SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-03-06SenateMeasure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
2019-03-06SenateEmergency clause restored
2019-03-06SenateTitle restored
2019-03-06SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2019-02-19SenateEmergency clause stricken
2019-02-19SenateTitle stricken
2019-02-19SenateReported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed
2019-02-05SenateCoauthored by Representative Hilbert (principal House author)
2019-02-04SenateCoauthored by Senator Stanley
2019-02-05SenateSecond Reading referred to Finance
2019-02-04SenateAuthored by Senator Thompson
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback