OK SB1785 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-20 - Approved by Governor 05/20/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-20 - Approved by Governor 05/20/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Farmers markets; creating the Oklahoma Farmers Market and Farmers Hub Act; creating requirements for persons registering a farmers market and farmers hub with the Department of Agriculture, Food, and Forestry. Effective date.
Title
Farmers markets; creating the Oklahoma Farmers Market and Farmers Hub Act; creating requirements for persons registering a farmers market and farmers hub with the Department of Agriculture, Food, and Forestry. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Chuck Hall [R] | Rep. Garry Mize [R] | Rep. Derrel Fincher [R] | Rep. Kenton Patzkowsky [R] |
Rep. Logan Phillips [R] | Rep. Cynthia Roe [R] | Rep. Ajay Pittman [D] | Sen. Roland Pederson [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-05-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Agriculture And Wildlife: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Agriculture And Wildlife: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-20 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/20/2020 |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2020-05-14 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Phillips |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Pittman |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Patzkowsky |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Roe |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Fincher |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2020-05-14 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2020-05-14 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 98 Nays: 1 |
2020-05-14 | House | General Order |
2020-04-06 | House | Withdrawn from Agriculture and Rural Development, Direct to Calendar |
2020-03-17 | House | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Development |
2020-03-10 | House | First Reading |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 1 |
2020-03-09 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Pederson |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Mize (principal House author) |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Agriculture and Wildlife committee; CR filed |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Hall |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |