OK SB178 | 2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future SB178

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-20 - Approved by Governor 04/20/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Oklahoma Children's Code; modifying procedures for trial reunification. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Oklahoma Children's Code; modifying procedures for trial reunification. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-18 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - House: Children, Youth and Family Services Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Judiciary Senate Bill: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Judiciary: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-20SenateApproved by Governor 04/20/2023
2023-04-19SenateSent to Governor
2023-04-19HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2023-04-19SenateEnrolled, to House
2023-04-18SenateReferred for enrollment
2023-04-18HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2023-04-18HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 0
2023-04-18HouseGeneral Order
2023-04-06HouseCR; Do Pass Children, Youth and Family Services Committee
2023-03-29HouseSecond Reading referred to Children, Youth and Family Services
2023-03-06HouseFirst Reading
2023-03-06SenateEngrossed to House
2023-03-02SenateReferred for engrossment
2023-03-02SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
2023-03-02SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2023-02-13SenateCoauthored by Senator Boren
2023-02-08SenateCoauthored by Representative Lawson (principal House author)
2023-02-07SenateReported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed
2023-02-07SenateSecond Reading referred to Judiciary
2023-02-06SenateAuthored by Senator Daniels
2023-02-06SenateFirst Reading

Same As/Similar To

SB178 (Carry Over) 2023-04-20 - Approved by Governor 04/20/2023

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb178&Session=2300
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20INT/SB/SB178%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20FLR/SFLR/SB178%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20ENGR/SB/SB178%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20FLR/HFLR/SB178%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20ENR/SB/SB178%20ENR.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/Senate/SB178%20INT%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/SB178%20ENGR%20BILLSUM.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/SB178_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/SB178_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback