OK SB1777 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-15 - Coauthored by Representative Roberts (Sean) (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-15 - Coauthored by Representative Roberts (Sean) (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Natural gas; recodifying section.
Title
Natural gas; recodifying section.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Energy: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Roberts (Sean) (principal House author) |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Energy committee; CR filed |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Energy |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Authored by Senator Dahm |
2022-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |