OK SB1774 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-08 - Approved by Governor 05/08/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-08 - Approved by Governor 05/08/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Credit card transactions; allowing private educational institutions to charge certain fee. Effective date.
Title
Credit card transactions; allowing private educational institutions to charge certain fee. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 25 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-04-04 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 43 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2012-04-04 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 51 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-04-04 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 43 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2012-04-04 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 51 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-08 | Approved by Governor 05/08/2012 | |
2012-05-03 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-05-03 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2012-05-03 | Enrolled, to House | |
2012-05-02 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-05-02 | Measure passed: Ayes: 25 Nays: 17 | |
2012-05-02 | HAs adopted | |
2012-04-09 | HAs read | |
2012-04-05 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-04-04 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-04-04 | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 51 Nays: 40; Ayes: 43 Nays: 37 | |
2012-04-04 | General Order | |
2012-03-29 | Title restored | |
2012-03-29 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2012-03-19 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2012-03-15 | First Reading | |
2012-03-15 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-03-14 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-14 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 32 Nays: 9 | |
2012-03-14 | General Order, Amended | |
2012-03-14 | Senate Rule suspended | |
2012-02-27 | coauthored by Jolley | |
2012-02-27 | coauthored by Denney (principal House author) | |
2012-02-27 | Title stricken | |
2012-02-27 | Reported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Education | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Senator Laster | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
14A | 2 | 211 | New Code | See Bill Text |
14A | 2 | 417 | New Code | See Bill Text |