OK SB1755 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-26 - Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-26 - Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Affordable housing; creating a task force to study and make recommendations for providing affordable housing in this state. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Affordable housing; creating a task force to study and make recommendations for providing affordable housing in this state. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. John Haste [R] | Rep. Mark Tedford [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Business & Commerce: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-26 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Tedford (principal House author) |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Haste |
2024-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |