OK SB1752 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Withdrawn from Appropriations, Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Oklahoma Viticulture and Enology Center Development Revolving Fund; modifying purpose. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Oklahoma Viticulture and Enology Center Development Revolving Fund; modifying purpose. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-06HouseWithdrawn from Appropriations, Direct to Calendar
2020-04-06HouseWithdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee
2020-03-17HouseReferred to Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee
2020-03-17HouseSecond Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
2020-03-05HouseFirst Reading
2020-03-05SenateEngrossed to House
2020-03-04SenateReferred for engrossment
2020-03-04SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 6
2020-03-04SenateTitle restored
2020-03-04SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2020-02-19SenateTitle stricken
2020-02-19SenateReported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
2020-02-12SenateCoauthored by Representative West (Josh) (principal House author)
2020-02-12SenateReferred to Appropriations
2020-02-12SenateRecommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appr/Sub-Natural Resources and Regulatory Services sub-committee
2020-02-10SenateReferred to Appr/Sub-Natural Resources and Regulatory Services
2020-02-06SenateSecond Reading referred to Appropriations
2020-02-03SenateAuthored by Senator Leewright
2020-02-03SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback